Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/27/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/26/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/26/2001