Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/26/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001