Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/02/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/02/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/10/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/23/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/12/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/12/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/12/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/20/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/21/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/06/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/11/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/11/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/10/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/28/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/01/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/12/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/19/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/21/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/27/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/03/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/03/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/05/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/08/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/08/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/07/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/19/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/19/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/16/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/24/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 01/24/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/01/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/07/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/25/2000