Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/28/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/02/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/02/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/04/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/06/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/12/2000