Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/29/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/11/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/11/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/13/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/13/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/13/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/13/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/13/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/13/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/27/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/27/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/04/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/08/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/09/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/09/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/10/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/11/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/11/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/15/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/16/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/16/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/17/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/17/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/23/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/23/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/24/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/24/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/24/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/06/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/06/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/06/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/06/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/06/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/06/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/06/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/12/2000