Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/11/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/16/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/16/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/17/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/17/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/17/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/17/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/17/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/17/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/17/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/20/1999