Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/19/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/28/2000