Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/19/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/19/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/19/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/19/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/23/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/07/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/07/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/12/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/19/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/19/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/21/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/11/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/18/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/24/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/24/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/18/2000