Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 10/27/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/27/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/03/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/03/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 11/03/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/03/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/03/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/03/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/03/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/04/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/04/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/16/1999