Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/17/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 09/17/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/17/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/17/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/21/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/24/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/28/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/30/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/05/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/05/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/05/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/07/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/07/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/07/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/07/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/20/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/20/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/20/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/20/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/28/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/16/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/16/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/16/2000