Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/12/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/18/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/18/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/19/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/19/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/24/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/25/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/25/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/07/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/07/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/07/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/07/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/07/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/07/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/07/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/22/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/1999