Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/04/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/16/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/16/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/17/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/24/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/24/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/24/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/14/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/14/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/14/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/21/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/21/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/21/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/28/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/28/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/28/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/11/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/11/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/11/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/11/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/26/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/25/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/25/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/29/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/01/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/15/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew