Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/18/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/28/2000