Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/03/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/03/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/16/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/12/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/18/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/13/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew