Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/14/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/12/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/26/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/26/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/26/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/26/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/26/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/26/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/26/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/26/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/26/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/2000