Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/07/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/21/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/21/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/28/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/05/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/05/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/05/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/06/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/10/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/10/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/10/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/25/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/25/2000