Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/14/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/14/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/14/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/14/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/18/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 09/18/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/18/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/18/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/18/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/18/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/18/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/20/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/20/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/20/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/20/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/20/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/20/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/20/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/25/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/25/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/27/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/27/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/27/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/02/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/11/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/11/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/25/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/25/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/2000