Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/26/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2000