Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/10/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/12/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/26/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/27/2000