Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/23/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/23/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/23/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/25/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/13/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/25/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/26/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/26/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 09/26/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/27/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/27/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/28/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/02/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/04/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/04/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/04/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/05/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/06/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/10/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/11/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/11/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/11/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/17/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/18/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/18/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/23/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/23/2000