Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/15/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/20/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/13/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/25/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/06/2000