Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/25/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/08/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/08/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/08/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/13/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/21/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/10/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/11/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/13/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/17/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/17/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/25/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/14/2000