Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/19/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/19/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/19/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/09/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/09/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/09/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/03/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/17/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/17/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/13/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/13/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/22/1999