Refine your search

Date Major Actions
10/10/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-286.
10/10/2000 Signed by President.
10/10/2000 Presented to President.
09/19/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 83 - 15. Record Vote Number: 251.
05/24/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 237 - 197 (Roll no. 228).(text: CR H3662-3670)
05/22/2000 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-632.
05/15/2000 Introduced in House