Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/08/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/11/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/27/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/07/2000