Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/13/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/27/2000