Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/02/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/19/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/19/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/19/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/25/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/12/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/23/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/06/2000