Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/23/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/23/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/23/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/23/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/27/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/27/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/27/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/05/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/10/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/11/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/11/2000