Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/03/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/09/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/24/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/24/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/02/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/02/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/02/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/16/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/16/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/16/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/16/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/24/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/14/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/22/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/01/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/01/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/01/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/20/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/30/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/21/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/29/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/30/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 04/06/2000