Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/22/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/22/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/22/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/22/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/22/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/22/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/22/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/22/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/22/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/23/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/23/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/23/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/23/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/23/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/26/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/26/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/26/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/26/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/26/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/27/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/27/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/27/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/27/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/27/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/27/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/27/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/27/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/27/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/27/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/27/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/27/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/28/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/28/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/28/2000
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/28/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/28/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/29/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/29/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/29/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/29/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/29/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/29/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/12/2000