Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/09/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/17/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/14/2000