Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/08/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/08/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/14/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/14/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/14/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/16/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/16/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/13/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/13/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/14/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/14/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/14/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/14/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/14/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/14/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/16/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/16/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/16/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/16/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/16/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/22/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/02/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/02/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/02/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/04/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/04/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/04/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/09/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/09/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/09/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/15/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/15/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/15/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/15/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/15/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/15/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/15/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/15/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/15/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/15/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/15/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/15/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/16/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/22/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/23/2000