Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 11/01/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/01/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/01/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/01/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2000