Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/19/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/08/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/09/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/09/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/30/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/09/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/19/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/27/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/29/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/11/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/12/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/19/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/26/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/18/2000