Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/15/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/15/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 10/06/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/26/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/28/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/17/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/17/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/15/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/17/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/19/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/19/2000