Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/17/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/19/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/19/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/19/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/23/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/23/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/26/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/26/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/26/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/26/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/16/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/09/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/16/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/22/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/23/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/06/2000