Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/10/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/05/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/05/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/09/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/14/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/01/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/01/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/01/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/05/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/05/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/05/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/16/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/16/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/16/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/02/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/02/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/02/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/09/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/22/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/11/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/11/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/11/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/19/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/21/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/21/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/21/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/21/2000