Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/04/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/04/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/04/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/04/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/11/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/15/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/15/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/15/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/26/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/26/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/14/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/14/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/07/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/19/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/14/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/14/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/25/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/16/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/16/1999