Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/25/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/25/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/25/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/25/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/25/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/16/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/21/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/21/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 08/04/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/04/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/04/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/13/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/13/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/13/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/13/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/21/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/04/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/21/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 01/27/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/10/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/20/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/25/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/11/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/19/2000