Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/10/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/10/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/10/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/13/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/13/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/24/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/07/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/07/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/1999