Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/04/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/04/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/11/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/18/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/18/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/24/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/24/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/10/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/24/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/24/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/24/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/24/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/12/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/21/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/21/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/21/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/04/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/04/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/04/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/09/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/09/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/30/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/13/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/13/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/14/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/18/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/05/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/05/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/08/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/15/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2000