Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/29/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/12/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/12/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/30/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/30/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/30/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/03/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/13/2000