Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/26/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/26/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/04/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/14/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/17/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/07/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/07/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/29/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/08/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/30/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/26/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/01/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/31/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/07/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/12/2000