Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/13/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/09/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/09/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/24/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/16/1999