Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/25/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/13/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/13/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/13/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/28/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/11/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/11/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/26/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/08/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/08/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/18/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/02/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/02/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/09/2000