Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/25/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/25/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/25/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/25/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/25/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/27/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 04/27/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/04/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/04/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/20/2000