Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/02/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/02/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/02/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/02/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/02/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 02/02/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/11/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/24/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/02/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/02/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/02/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/02/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/02/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/02/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/02/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/04/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/11/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/17/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/17/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/17/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/14/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/21/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/21/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/04/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/04/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/18/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/25/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/25/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/16/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew