Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/22/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/22/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/23/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/31/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/31/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/08/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/15/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/17/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/17/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/17/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/23/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/23/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/23/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/25/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/25/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/25/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/28/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/28/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/28/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/28/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/28/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/28/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/28/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/29/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/29/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/29/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/29/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/29/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/30/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/01/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/01/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/01/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/01/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/02/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/02/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/02/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/02/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/02/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/02/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 10/02/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/02/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 10/02/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/02/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/02/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/02/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/02/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/02/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/02/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/02/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/05/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/05/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/07/1998