Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/30/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/30/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/30/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/30/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/01/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/01/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/20/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/24/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/29/1998