Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/03/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/03/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/03/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/03/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/03/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/09/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/09/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/09/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/09/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/09/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/12/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/12/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/19/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/19/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/19/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/19/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/19/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/19/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/25/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/25/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/22/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/22/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/22/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/14/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/14/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/11/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/11/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/22/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/22/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 06/22/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/16/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/16/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/16/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/16/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/16/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/16/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/16/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/16/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/16/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/17/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/17/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/29/1998